+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On April 20, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Indefinitely postponed
On March 7, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM2281 filed
- Placed on General File with AM2281
On February 22, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Recommitted to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee
- Chambers MO188 prevailed
- Chambers MO188 Recommit to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee filed
On February 17, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Johnson name added
On February 10, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Garrett name added
- Kolterman name added
On February 4, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Fox name added
On January 28, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Larson name added
On January 19, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Friesen name added
On January 13, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Schnoor name added
On January 12, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Lindstrom name added
- Groene name added
- Ebke priority resolution
On January 11, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Watermeier name added
On January 6, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Title printed. Carryover resolution
On May 6, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Placed on General File
On February 6, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 25, 2015
On January 23, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee
On January 21, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor