+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On October 21, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for December 01, 2015
- Notice of hearing for November 12, 2015 (cancel)
On October 8, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for October 27, 2015
- Notice of hearing for October 22, 2015 (cancel)
On August 10, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for December 03, 2015
- Notice of hearing for November 12, 2015
- Notice of hearing for October 22, 2015
- Notice of hearing for October 05, 2015
- Notice of hearing for October 01, 2015
- Notice of hearing for September 16, 2015
On May 21, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee
On May 14, 2015 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Executive Board
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor