+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 18, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Executive Board report
- President/Speaker signed
- Enrolled resolution
- Correctly enrolled
On April 11, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Adopted
- Executive Board AM2179 adopted
On March 8, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Executive Board AM2179 filed
- Reported to the Legislature for further consideration with AM2179
On February 1, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 21, 2018
On January 25, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Executive Board
On January 23, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Speaker's announcement
- Laid over
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor