+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On April 20, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Indefinitely postponed
On January 5, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Title printed. Carryover resolution
On March 22, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Wayne name added
On March 2, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Brewer name added
On February 11, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for March 01, 2021
On January 15, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Education Committee
On January 14, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Murman name added
On January 13, 2021 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsors (4)
Briese
Type:
Primary Sponsor