+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On August 13, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Indefinitely postponed
On January 8, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Title printed. Carryover resolution
On May 30, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Arch name added
On May 16, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee
On May 13, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Vargas name added
On May 10, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Lowe name added
On May 9, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Speaker's announcement
- Laid over
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsors (4)
Hunt
Type:
Primary Sponsor