+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On August 13, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Indefinitely postponed
On February 18, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Albrecht name added
On February 12, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Education AM2214 filed
- Placed on General File with AM2214
On January 16, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for January 27, 2020
On January 15, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Education Committee
On January 14, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Sponsors (2)
Murman
Type:
Primary Sponsor