+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 23, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Returned by Governor without approval on April 23, 2018
On April 18, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Passed on Final Reading 31-15-3
- Presented to Governor on April 18, 2018
- President/Speaker signed
On April 10, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
- Harr FA149 withdrawn
- Walz AM2713 adopted
- Walz AM2665 withdrawn
- Enrollment and Review ER149 adopted
On April 9, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Harr FA149 filed
On April 3, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Walz AM2713 filed
On March 27, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Bolz name added
- Enrollment and Review ER149 filed
- Placed on Select File with ER149
On March 26, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Linehan AM2572 adopted
- Education AM2044 adopted
- Linehan AM2333 withdrawn
- Linehan AM2572 filed
- Erdman MO299 failed
- Erdman MO299 Bracket until April 12, 2018 filed
- Hughes AM2366 lost
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
- Walz AM2665 filed
On March 12, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Hughes AM2366 filed
- Linehan AM2333 pending
On March 9, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Linehan AM2333 pending
- Linehan AM2333 filed
- Education AM2044 pending
On February 23, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Education AM2044 filed
- Placed on General File with AM2044
On February 20, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Bolz priority bill
On January 31, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 12, 2018
On January 17, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Education Committee
On January 16, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Baker name added
On January 11, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor