+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 20, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Indefinitely postponed
On February 25, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Placed on General File
On February 22, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Speaker priority bill
On January 22, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 09, 2016
On January 20, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee
On January 15, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
On January 6, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Attorney General Opinion 15-011 to Davis
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor