+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 4, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on April 04, 2018
On March 29, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on March 29, 2018
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 49-0-0
- Dispensing of reading at large approved
On March 20, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On March 15, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
- Friesen AM2385 adopted
- Enrollment and Review ER126 adopted
On March 13, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Friesen AM2385 filed
On March 12, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Enrollment and Review ER126 filed
- Placed on Select File with ER126
On March 9, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Transportation and Telecommunications AM1908 adopted
- Hilgers AM2325 filed
- Friesen AM2323 filed
- Hilgers AM2325 withdrawn
- Friesen AM2323 adopted
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
On March 8, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Transportation and Telecommunications AM1908 pending
On February 23, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Transportation and Telecommunications AM1908 filed
- Placed on General File with AM1908
On February 21, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Geist name added
On February 13, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Geist priority bill
On February 2, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Wayne name added
On January 26, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 05, 2018
On January 17, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee
On January 16, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Brewer name added
On January 11, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction