+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 18, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on April 17, 2018
On April 11, 2018 in the Legislature:
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 41-0-8
- Dispensing of reading at large approved
- Presented to Governor on April 11, 2018
On April 3, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
- Correction
On March 28, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Chambers MO305 Bracket until April 18, 2018 filed
- Schumacher FA141 filed
- Schumacher FA141 lost
- Enrollment and Review ER144 adopted
- Chambers MO305 withdrawn
- Wayne FA129 withdrawn
- Wayne FA131 withdrawn
- Wayne FA133 withdrawn
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
On March 27, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Enrollment and Review ER144 filed
- Placed on Select File with ER144
On March 22, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Judiciary AM2209 adopted
- Chambers MO289 Bracket until April 8, 2018 filed
- Chambers MO289 failed
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
- Wayne FA129 filed
- Wayne FA131 filed
- Wayne FA133 filed
On March 8, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Judiciary AM2209 filed
- Placed on General File with AM2209
On February 20, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Wayne priority bill
On January 25, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 08, 2018
On January 17, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Judiciary Committee
On January 11, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor