+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 23, 2014 in the Legislature:
On April 2, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on April 02, 2014
On March 27, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on March 27, 2014
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 44-0-5
- Dispensing of reading at large approved
On March 25, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading Second with ST69
On March 24, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Avery AM2590 filed
- Returned to Select File for specific amendment
- Avery AM2590 adopted
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Reengrossment
On March 19, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On March 18, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
- Enrollment and Review ER166 adopted
On March 11, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Enrollment and Review ER166 filed
- Placed on Select File with ER166
On March 6, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
- Appropriations AM2025 adopted
On February 21, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Appropriations AM2025 filed
- Placed on General File with AM2025
On February 12, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Appropriations priority bill
On January 23, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for January 30, 2014
On January 22, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Appropriations Committee
On January 17, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor