+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On August 18, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on August 15, 2020
On August 12, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on August 11, 2020
On August 11, 2020 in the Legislature:
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4
On August 4, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading Second
On August 3, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Reengrossment
- Brewer AM3299 adopted
- Returned to Select File for specific amendment
On July 30, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Brewer AM3299 filed
On March 23, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On March 6, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
On March 3, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Select File
On February 26, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
On February 24, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Placed on General File
- Date of introduction
+ − Votes (4)
August 11, 2020: Final Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 1
Details:
+
−
- Kate Bolz: Yes
- Ernie Chambers: Yes
- Sue Crawford: Yes
- Sara Howard: Yes
- Rick Kolowski: Yes
- Steve Lathrop: Yes
- Jim Scheer: Yes
- Curt Friesen: Present - Not Voting
- Mike Groene: Excused - Not Voting
- Matt Hansen: Yes
- Robert Hilkemann: Yes
- Dan Hughes: Yes
- Mark Kolterman: Yes
- Brett Lindstrom: Yes
- John McCollister: Yes
- Adam Morfeld: Yes
- Patty Pansing Brooks: Yes
- John Stinner: Present - Not Voting
- Matt Williams: Present - Not Voting
- Joni Albrecht: Yes
- Carol Blood: Yes
- Bruce Bostelman: Yes
- Tom Brewer: Yes
- Tom Briese: Yes
- Steve Erdman: Yes
- Suzanne Geist: Yes
- Steve Halloran: Yes
- Mike Hilgers: Yes
- Lou Ann Linehan: Yes
- John Lowe: Yes
- Mike McDonnell: Yes
- Dan Quick: Yes
- Tony Vargas: Yes
- Lynne Walz: Yes
- Justin Wayne: Yes
- Anna Wishart: Yes
- Robert Clements: Yes
- John Arch: Yes
- Tom Brandt: Yes
- Machaela Cavanaugh: Yes
- Wendy DeBoer: Yes
- Myron Dorn: Yes
- Tim Gragert: Yes
- Megan Hunt: Yes
- Andrew La Grone: Yes
- Mike Moser: Yes
- Dave Murman: Yes
- Julie Slama: Yes
- Ben Hansen: Yes
August 3, 2020: AM 3299 Brewer - RETURN TO SELECT FILE
- Yeas: 42
- Present/NV: 6
- Absent: 1
Details:
+
−
- Kate Bolz: Excused - Not Voting
- Ernie Chambers: Yes
- Sue Crawford: Yes
- Sara Howard: Yes
- Rick Kolowski: Yes
- Steve Lathrop: Yes
- Jim Scheer: Yes
- Curt Friesen: Present - Not Voting
- Mike Groene: Present - Not Voting
- Matt Hansen: Present - Not Voting
- Robert Hilkemann: Yes
- Dan Hughes: Yes
- Mark Kolterman: Yes
- Brett Lindstrom: Yes
- John McCollister: Yes
- Adam Morfeld: Yes
- Patty Pansing Brooks: Yes
- John Stinner: Present - Not Voting
- Matt Williams: Yes
- Joni Albrecht: Yes
- Carol Blood: Yes
- Bruce Bostelman: Yes
- Tom Brewer: Yes
- Tom Briese: Yes
- Steve Erdman: Yes
- Suzanne Geist: Yes
- Steve Halloran: Yes
- Mike Hilgers: Yes
- Lou Ann Linehan: Yes
- John Lowe: Yes
- Mike McDonnell: Yes
- Dan Quick: Yes
- Tony Vargas: Yes
- Lynne Walz: Yes
- Justin Wayne: Present - Not Voting
- Anna Wishart: Yes
- Robert Clements: Yes
- John Arch: Yes
- Tom Brandt: Yes
- Machaela Cavanaugh: Yes
- Wendy DeBoer: Yes
- Myron Dorn: Yes
- Tim Gragert: Yes
- Megan Hunt: Yes
- Andrew La Grone: Yes
- Mike Moser: Yes
- Dave Murman: Yes
- Julie Slama: Yes
- Ben Hansen: Present - Not Voting
August 3, 2020: AM 3299 Brewer
- Yeas: 43
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 1
Details:
+
−
- Kate Bolz: Excused - Not Voting
- Ernie Chambers: Yes
- Sue Crawford: Yes
- Sara Howard: Yes
- Rick Kolowski: Yes
- Steve Lathrop: Yes
- Jim Scheer: Yes
- Curt Friesen: Present - Not Voting
- Mike Groene: Present - Not Voting
- Matt Hansen: Yes
- Robert Hilkemann: Yes
- Dan Hughes: Yes
- Mark Kolterman: Yes
- Brett Lindstrom: Yes
- John McCollister: Present - Not Voting
- Adam Morfeld: Yes
- Patty Pansing Brooks: Yes
- John Stinner: Present - Not Voting
- Matt Williams: Yes
- Joni Albrecht: Yes
- Carol Blood: Yes
- Bruce Bostelman: Yes
- Tom Brewer: Yes
- Tom Briese: Yes
- Steve Erdman: Yes
- Suzanne Geist: Yes
- Steve Halloran: Yes
- Mike Hilgers: Yes
- Lou Ann Linehan: Yes
- John Lowe: Yes
- Mike McDonnell: Yes
- Dan Quick: Yes
- Tony Vargas: Yes
- Lynne Walz: Yes
- Justin Wayne: Present - Not Voting
- Anna Wishart: Yes
- Robert Clements: Yes
- John Arch: Yes
- Tom Brandt: Yes
- Machaela Cavanaugh: Yes
- Wendy DeBoer: Yes
- Myron Dorn: Yes
- Tim Gragert: Yes
- Megan Hunt: Yes
- Andrew La Grone: Yes
- Mike Moser: Yes
- Dave Murman: Yes
- Julie Slama: Yes
- Ben Hansen: Yes
February 26, 2020: ADVANCE TO E&R INITIAL
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 9
- Absent: 4
Details:
+
−
- Kate Bolz: Yes
- Ernie Chambers: Present - Not Voting
- Sue Crawford: Yes
- Sara Howard: Yes
- Rick Kolowski: Yes
- Steve Lathrop: Yes
- Jim Scheer: Yes
- Curt Friesen: Present - Not Voting
- Mike Groene: Yes
- Matt Hansen: Excused - Not Voting
- Robert Hilkemann: Present - Not Voting
- Dan Hughes: Yes
- Mark Kolterman: Excused - Not Voting
- Brett Lindstrom: Yes
- John McCollister: Present - Not Voting
- Adam Morfeld: Yes
- Patty Pansing Brooks: Yes
- John Stinner: Excused - Not Voting
- Matt Williams: Present - Not Voting
- Joni Albrecht: Yes
- Carol Blood: Yes
- Bruce Bostelman: Yes
- Tom Brewer: Yes
- Tom Briese: Yes
- Steve Erdman: Yes
- Suzanne Geist: Yes
- Steve Halloran: Yes
- Mike Hilgers: Yes
- Lou Ann Linehan: Yes
- John Lowe: Yes
- Mike McDonnell: Yes
- Dan Quick: Yes
- Tony Vargas: Present - Not Voting
- Lynne Walz: Yes
- Justin Wayne: Present - Not Voting
- Anna Wishart: Yes
- Robert Clements: Present - Not Voting
- John Arch: Excused - Not Voting
- Tom Brandt: Yes
- Machaela Cavanaugh: Yes
- Wendy DeBoer: Present - Not Voting
- Myron Dorn: Yes
- Tim Gragert: Yes
- Megan Hunt: Yes
- Andrew La Grone: Yes
- Mike Moser: Yes
- Dave Murman: Yes
- Julie Slama: Yes
- Ben Hansen: Yes
+ − Sponsor
Brewer
Type:
Primary Sponsor