+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 20, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on April 18, 2016
On April 12, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on April 12, 2016
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 48-0-1
- Dispensing of reading at large approved
- Hadley motion to suspend rules and vote on final passage without further amendments, motions, or debate withdrawn
On April 7, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Hadley motion to suspend rules and vote on final passage without further amendments, motions, or debate filed
On March 22, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On March 21, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
- Enrollment and Review ER193 adopted
On March 16, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Enrollment and Review ER193 filed
- Placed on Select File with ER193
On March 15, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
- Appropriations AM2418 adopted
On March 9, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Appropriations AM2418 filed
- Placed on General File with AM2418
On January 26, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 16, 2016
On January 20, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Brasch priority bill
On January 19, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Appropriations Committee
On January 14, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor