+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 23, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on April 19, 2018
On April 18, 2018 in the Legislature:
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 49-0-0
- Presented to Governor on April 18, 2018
On April 10, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
- Lowe AM2818 adopted
- Lowe AM2818 filed
- Enrollment and Review ER148 adopted
On March 27, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Enrollment and Review ER148 filed
- Placed on Select File with ER148
On March 26, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Lowe AM2659 filed
- Business and Labor AM1952 adopted
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
- Lowe AM2659 adopted
- McDonnell AM2673 filed
- McDonnell AM2673 adopted
On February 22, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Business and Labor AM1952 filed
- Placed on General File with AM1952
On February 21, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Speaker priority bill
On January 26, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 05, 2018
On January 11, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Business and Labor Committee
On January 10, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor