+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 4, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on April 04, 2018
On April 3, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on April 03, 2018
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 47-0-2
On March 22, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading with ST49
On March 21, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
On March 14, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Select File
On March 13, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Business and Labor AM2359 pending
- Chambers MO262 Bracket until April 18, 2018 filed
- Chambers MO262 pending
- Chambers MO262 failed
- Chambers MO263 failed
- Chambers MO263 Reconsider the vote to bracket filed
- Chambers MO264 Recommit to Business and Labor Committee filed
- Chambers MO264 withdrawn
- Business and Labor AM2359 adopted
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
On March 12, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Business and Labor AM2359 filed
- Placed on General File with AM2359
On January 26, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 26, 2018
On January 11, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Business and Labor Committee
On January 10, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor