+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (40)
On April 18, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Indefinitely postponed
On April 3, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Krist MO314 Recommit to Revenue Committee filed
- Harr AM2709 filed
- Erdman MO315 pending
- Erdman MO315 Reconsider the vote to bracket filed
- Erdman MO313 failed
- Erdman MO313 pending
- Erdman MO313 Bracket until April 18, 2018 filed
- Chambers MO312 withdrawn
- Chambers MO312 Bracket until April 18, 2018 filed
- Revenue AM2542 pending
On March 28, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Harr AM2682 filed
On March 23, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Harr AM2622 filed
- Harr AM2621 filed
- Harr AM2618 filed
- Harr AM2619 filed
- Harr AM2620 filed
- Harr AM2616 filed
- Harr AM2615 filed
- Harr AM2617 filed
On March 21, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Revenue AM2542 filed
- Attorney General Opinion 18-001 to Kuehn
- Placed on General File with AM2542
- Harr FA126 filed
- Harr FA123 filed
- Harr FA124 filed
- Harr FA125 filed
On February 20, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Smith priority bill
On January 26, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Smith AM1672 filed
- Smith AM1670 filed
- Smith AM1668 filed
- Smith AM1671 filed
- Smith AM1669 filed
- Smith AM1667 filed
- Smith AM1622 filed
- Smith AM1621 filed
- Smith AM1620 filed
On January 24, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for January 31, 2018
On January 11, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Revenue Committee
On January 10, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor