+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (41)
On April 23, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Provisions/portions of LB1084 amended into LB946 by AM2047
- Provisions/portions of LB833 amended into LB946 by AM2047
- Provisions/portions of LB743 amended into LB946 by AM2047
- Provisions/portions of LB726 amended into LB946 by AM2047
- Provisions/portions of LB219 amended into LB946 by AM2121
- Provisions/portions of LB167 amended into LB946 by AM2120
- Provisions/portions of LB1084 amended into LB946 by AM2047
On April 2, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on April 02, 2014
On March 27, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on March 27, 2014
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 43-0-6
- Dispensing of reading at large approved
On March 24, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading with ST66
On March 20, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Karpisek AM2517 withdrawn
- Enrollment and Review ER179 adopted
- Lautenbaugh FA267 withdrawn
- Harr AM2502 withdrawn
- Harr AM2548 filed
- Harr AM2548 adopted
- Scheer AM2448 filed
- Scheer AM2448 adopted
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
On March 19, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Karpisek AM2517 filed
- Lautenbaugh FA267 filed
- Harr AM2502 filed
On March 18, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Enrollment and Review ER179 filed
- Placed on Select File with ER179
On March 13, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM2047 adopted
- Avery AM2121 adopted
- Murante AM2120 adopted
- Dubas AM2204 adopted
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
On March 7, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Dubas AM2204 filed
On March 6, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Murante AM2120 filed
- Avery AM2121 filed
On February 25, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM2047 filed
- Placed on General File with AM2047
On February 20, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Murante priority bill
On January 29, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 05, 2014
On January 21, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee
On January 16, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Amendments (10)
Scheer AM2448
adopted
Harr AM2548
adopted
Karpisek AM2517
withdrawn
Lautenbaugh FA267
withdrawn
Harr AM2502
withdrawn
Enrollment and Review ER179
adopted
Dubas AM2204
adopted
Murante AM2120
adopted
Avery AM2121
adopted
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor