+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 3, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on April 03, 2013
On April 2, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Hadley explanation of vote
On March 28, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on March 28, 2013
- Janssen explanation of vote
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 42-0-7
On March 25, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On March 21, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
- Enrollment and Review ER23 adopted
On February 28, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Enrollment and Review ER23 filed
- Placed on Select File with ER23
- Correction
On February 27, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Chambers FA10 adopted
- Chambers FA9 withdrawn
- Chambers FA13 withdrawn
- Chambers FA11 adopted
- Chambers FA12 withdrawn
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
On February 22, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Chambers FA13 filed
- Chambers FA12 filed
- Chambers FA11 filed
- Chambers FA10 filed
- Chambers FA9 filed
On February 12, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Placed on General File
On January 30, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 07, 2013
On January 14, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Natural Resources Committee
On January 10, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Amendments (6)
Enrollment and Review ER23
adopted
Chambers FA12
withdrawn
Chambers FA13
withdrawn
Chambers FA10
adopted
Chambers FA11
adopted
Chambers FA9
withdrawn
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor