+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 20, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on April 18, 2016
On April 12, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on April 12, 2016
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 48-0-1
- Dispensing of reading at large approved
- Hadley motion to suspend rules and vote on final passage without further amendments, motions, or debate withdrawn
On April 7, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Hadley motion to suspend rules and vote on final passage without further amendments, motions, or debate filed
On April 4, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading with ST82
On April 1, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
- Smith AM2769 adopted
- Enrollment and Review ER225 adopted
On March 29, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Smith AM2769 filed
On March 24, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Enrollment and Review ER225 filed
- Placed on Select File with ER225
On March 22, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
- Smith AM2301 withdrawn
- Transportation and Telecommunications AM2356 adopted
On March 3, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Transportation and Telecommunications AM2356 filed
- Placed on General File with AM2356
On February 25, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Smith AM2301 filed
On February 22, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 29, 2016 (rehearing)
On February 19, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Transportation and Telecommunications priority bill
On January 22, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 01, 2016
On January 14, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee
On January 13, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor