+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On August 18, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Provisions/portions of LB933 amended into LB632 by AM2865
On August 13, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Indefinitely postponed
On February 27, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Natural Resources AM2394 filed
- Placed on General File with AM2394
On February 6, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 13, 2020
On January 27, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Vargas name added
On January 13, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Natural Resources Committee
On January 10, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Sponsors (2)
Crawford
Type:
Primary Sponsor