+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 10, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on April 10, 2014
- Presented to Governor on April 10, 2014
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1
On April 2, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On March 31, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
- Enrollment and Review ER212 adopted
On March 26, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Enrollment and Review ER212 filed
- Placed on Select File with ER212
On March 24, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
- Transportation and Telecommunications AM2039 adopted
On February 26, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Transportation and Telecommunications AM2039 filed
- Placed on General File with AM2039
On February 11, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 18, 2014
On January 16, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee
On January 15, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor