+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 23, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Provisions/portions of LB1136 amended into LB909 by AM2284
- Provisions/portions of LB896 amended into LB909 by AM2284
- Provisions/portions of LB860 amended into LB909 by AM2647
- Provisions/portions of LB895 amended into LB909 by AM2284
- Provisions/portions of LB740 amended into LB909 by AM2284
- Provisions/portions of LB900 amended into LB909 by AM2647
- Provisions/portions of LB980 amended into LB909 by AM2647
- Provisions/portions of LB1011 amended into LB909 by AM2687
- Provisions/portions of LB1049 amended into LB909 by AM2284
- Provisions/portions of LB1092 amended into LB909 by AM2284
On April 18, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on April 11, 2018
On April 6, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on April 06, 2018
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 46-0-3
- Dispensing of reading at large approved
On April 3, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading with ST54
On March 28, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Harr AM2546 withdrawn
- Enrollment and Review ER145 adopted
- Harr AM2687 adopted
- Friesen AM2647 adopted
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
On March 27, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Brewer name added
- Harr AM2687 filed
- Friesen AM2647 filed
- Enrollment and Review ER145 filed
- Placed on Select File with ER145
On March 26, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Harr AM2546 filed
On March 22, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
- Transportation and Telecommunications AM2284 adopted
On March 13, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Transportation and Telecommunications AM2284 filed
- Placed on General File with AM2284
On February 20, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Transportation and Telecommunications priority bill
On January 19, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for January 30, 2018
On January 9, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee
On January 8, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor