+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 20, 2016 in the Legislature:
On April 13, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on April 13, 2016
On April 12, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Hadley motion to suspend rules and vote on final passage without further amendments, motions, or debate withdrawn
On April 7, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on April 07, 2016
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 45-0-4
- Dispensing of reading at large approved
- Hadley motion to suspend rules and vote on final passage without further amendments, motions, or debate filed
On April 4, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On April 1, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
- Enrollment and Review ER232 adopted
On March 29, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Enrollment and Review ER232 filed
- Placed on Select File with ER232
On March 24, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
- Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM2385 adopted
On March 10, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM2385 filed
- Placed on General File with AM2385
On February 19, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Government, Military and Veterans Affairs priority bill
On January 20, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for January 28, 2016
On January 12, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee
On January 11, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor