+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 23, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Provisions/portions of LB861 amended into LB863 by AM2131
On April 17, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Indefinitely postponed
On February 20, 2014 in the Legislature:
- General Affairs AM1697 filed
- Placed on General File with AM1697
On January 17, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for January 27, 2014
On January 14, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Referred to General Affairs Committee
On January 13, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Amendment
General Affairs AM1697
pending
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor