+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 20, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on April 18, 2022
- Approved by Governor on April 18, 2022
On April 12, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on April 12, 2022
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 44-0-5
- Dispensing of reading at large approved
- Cavanaugh, M. MO209 withdrawn
On April 5, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Cavanaugh, M. MO209 Bracket until April 20, 2022 filed
On March 10, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On March 8, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
On February 28, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Select File
On February 25, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
- Agriculture AM1626 adopted
On February 16, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Agriculture priority bill
On February 10, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Agriculture AM1626 filed
- Placed on General File with AM1626
On January 18, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for January 25, 2022
On January 10, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Agriculture Committee
On January 6, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Votes (3)
April 12, 2022: Final Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 3
February 25, 2022: AM 1626 Agriculture
- Yeas: 43
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 2
February 25, 2022: ADVANCE TO E&R INITIAL
- Yeas: 43
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Halloran
Type:
Primary Sponsor