+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 14, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on March 14, 2022
On March 9, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Wayne name added
- DeBoer explanation of vote
On March 8, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on March 8, 2022
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 44-0-5
On March 2, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On February 28, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
- Enrollment and Review ER104 adopted
On February 16, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Enrollment and Review ER104 filed
- Placed on Select File with ER104
On February 14, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
On February 3, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Placed on General File
On January 18, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for January 28, 2022
On January 10, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee
On January 6, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Votes (2)
March 8, 2022: Final Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Absent: 5
February 14, 2022: ADVANCE TO E&R INITIAL
- Yeas: 41
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Wishart
Type:
Primary Sponsor