+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 20, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Provisions/portions of LB1263 amended into LB843 by AM2075
- Provisions/portions of LB861 amended into LB843 by AM2075
- Provisions/portions of LB858 amended into LB843 by AM2075
- Provisions/portions of LB849 amended into LB843 by AM2075
- Provisions/portions of LB841 amended into LB843 by AM2075
- Provisions/portions of LB733 amended into LB843 by AM2139
- Approved by Governor on April 19, 2022
- Provisions/portions of LB928 amended into LB843 by AM2075
On April 13, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on April 13, 2022
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4
- Dispensing of reading at large approved
On April 11, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Flood AM2816 filed
- Flood AM2713 withdrawn
- Enrollment and Review ER170 adopted
- Flood AM2816 adopted
- Placed on Final Reading
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
On April 8, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Enrollment and Review ER170 filed
- Placed on Select File with ER170
On April 6, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Cavanaugh, J. AM2139 filed
- Hunt MO226 Indefinitely postpone filed
- Hunt MO226 withdrawn
- Brewer AM2689 adopted
- Cavanaugh, J. AM2139 adopted
- Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM2075 adopted
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
- Flood AM2713 filed
On March 31, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Brewer AM2689 filed
On March 2, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM2075 filed
- Placed on General File with AM2075
On February 22, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Government, Military and Veterans Affairs priority bill
On January 18, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for January 26, 2022
On January 10, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee
On January 6, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Votes (6)
April 13, 2022: Final Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 3
April 11, 2022: AM 2816 Flood
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 11
- Absent: 2
April 6, 2022: AM 2075 Government - AM 2689 Brewer
- Yeas: 45
- Absent: 4
April 6, 2022: AM 2075 Government - AM 2139 Cavanaugh, J.
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 4
April 6, 2022: AM 2075 Government
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 6
- Absent: 4
April 6, 2022: ADVANCE TO E&R INITIAL
- Yeas: 41
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsor
Brewer
Type:
Primary Sponsor