+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On August 18, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Provisions/portions of LB827 amended into LB1008 by AM2737
On August 13, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Indefinitely postponed
On February 6, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Hilkemann AM2320 filed
On February 4, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Hilkemann AM2266 filed
On January 30, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 10, 2020
On January 10, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Appropriations Committee
On January 8, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Sponsor
Hilkemann
Type:
Primary Sponsor