+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On August 18, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Provisions/portions of LB825 amended into LB755 by AM2480
On August 13, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Indefinitely postponed
On February 3, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Blood name added
On January 28, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Walz name added
- Williams name added
On January 24, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Murman name added
On January 23, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Cavanaugh name added
- Hansen, B. name added
- Arch name added
On January 14, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for January 22, 2020
On January 10, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Health and Human Services Committee
On January 8, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction