+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (39)
On April 20, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on April 19, 2016
On April 13, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Hadley motion to suspend rules and vote on final passage without further amendments, motions, or debate withdrawn
- Presented to Governor on April 13, 2016
- Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3
- President/Speaker signed
On April 7, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
- Hadley motion to suspend rules and vote on final passage without further amendments, motions, or debate filed
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
- Enrollment and Review ER239 adopted
On April 4, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Enrollment and Review ER239 filed
- Placed on Select File with ER239
On March 30, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Chambers MO242 pending
- Chambers FA110 lost
- Chambers MO241 Reconsider the vote on FA110 filed
- Chambers MO241 failed
- Chambers FA111 filed
- Chambers FA111 lost
- Chambers MO242 Reconsider the vote on FA111 filed
- Chambers MO242 failed
- Chambers FA112 filed
- Chambers FA112 withdrawn
- Larson FA113 filed
- Larson FA113 adopted
- Business and Labor AM2210 adopted
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
On March 29, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Business and Labor AM2210 pending
- Chambers FA109 filed
- Chair ruled FA109 is germane to committee amendment
- Chambers MO240 Reconsider the vote on FA109 filed
- Chambers FA109 lost
- Chambers MO240 failed
- Chambers FA110 filed
- Chambers FA110 pending
On February 22, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Business and Labor AM2210 filed
- Placed on General File with AM2210
On February 19, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Larson priority bill
On February 1, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 08, 2016
On January 11, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Business and Labor Committee
On January 8, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor