+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On August 13, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Indefinitely postponed
On February 12, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Stinner AM2416 filed
On February 5, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Bolz name added
On January 16, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for January 24, 2020
On January 10, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Health and Human Services Committee
On January 8, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Sponsors (2)
Stinner
Type:
Primary Sponsor