+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 23, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on April 23, 2018
On April 18, 2018 in the Legislature:
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 47-1-1
- Presented to Governor on April 18, 2018
On April 10, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading with ST65
On April 9, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
- Harr AM2831 adopted
- Enrollment and Review ER169 adopted
On April 5, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Harr AM2831 filed
On April 4, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Brewer name added
- Enrollment and Review ER169 filed
- Placed on Select File with ER169
On April 3, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM2392 adopted
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
- Brewer AM1863 withdrawn
On March 14, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM2392 filed
- Placed on General File with AM2392
On February 20, 2018 in the Legislature:
- State-Tribal Relations priority bill
On February 14, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Brewer AM1863 filed
- Notice of hearing for February 21, 2018
On January 8, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Vargas name added
- Blood name added
- Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee
On January 4, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction