+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On August 11, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on August 06, 2020
On August 3, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on July 31, 2020
On July 31, 2020 in the Legislature:
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 44-0-5
- Dispensing of reading at large approved
On July 23, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading with ST60
On July 20, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Hughes AM2772 withdrawn
- Enrollment and Review ER186 adopted
- Hughes AM2999 filed
- Hughes AM2999 adopted
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
On March 9, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Hughes AM2772 filed
On March 5, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Enrollment and Review ER186 filed
- Placed on Select File with ER186
On March 3, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
On February 25, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Speaker priority bill
On February 13, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Placed on General File
On February 3, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Blood name added
On January 15, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for January 28, 2020
On January 10, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Agriculture Committee
On January 8, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Votes (3)
July 31, 2020: Final Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 1
Details:
+
−
- Kate Bolz: Yes
- Ernie Chambers: Yes
- Sue Crawford: Yes
- Sara Howard: Yes
- Rick Kolowski: Yes
- Steve Lathrop: Yes
- Jim Scheer: Yes
- Curt Friesen: Yes
- Mike Groene: Present - Not Voting
- Matt Hansen: Yes
- Robert Hilkemann: Yes
- Dan Hughes: Yes
- Mark Kolterman: Yes
- Brett Lindstrom: Yes
- John McCollister: Yes
- Adam Morfeld: Yes
- Patty Pansing Brooks: Yes
- John Stinner: Present - Not Voting
- Matt Williams: Yes
- Joni Albrecht: Yes
- Carol Blood: Yes
- Bruce Bostelman: Yes
- Tom Brewer: Yes
- Tom Briese: Yes
- Steve Erdman: Yes
- Suzanne Geist: Yes
- Steve Halloran: Yes
- Mike Hilgers: Yes
- Lou Ann Linehan: Yes
- John Lowe: Yes
- Mike McDonnell: Yes
- Dan Quick: Yes
- Tony Vargas: Yes
- Lynne Walz: Yes
- Justin Wayne: Excused - Not Voting
- Anna Wishart: Yes
- Robert Clements: Yes
- John Arch: Yes
- Tom Brandt: Yes
- Machaela Cavanaugh: Present - Not Voting
- Wendy DeBoer: Yes
- Myron Dorn: Yes
- Tim Gragert: Yes
- Megan Hunt: Yes
- Andrew La Grone: Present - Not Voting
- Mike Moser: Yes
- Dave Murman: Yes
- Julie Slama: Yes
- Ben Hansen: Yes
July 20, 2020: AM 2999 Hughes
- Yeas: 42
- Present/NV: 7
Details:
+
−
- Kate Bolz: Yes
- Ernie Chambers: Yes
- Sue Crawford: Yes
- Sara Howard: Yes
- Rick Kolowski: Present - Not Voting
- Steve Lathrop: Yes
- Jim Scheer: Yes
- Curt Friesen: Yes
- Mike Groene: Yes
- Matt Hansen: Present - Not Voting
- Robert Hilkemann: Yes
- Dan Hughes: Yes
- Mark Kolterman: Yes
- Brett Lindstrom: Yes
- John McCollister: Present - Not Voting
- Adam Morfeld: Yes
- Patty Pansing Brooks: Yes
- John Stinner: Yes
- Matt Williams: Yes
- Joni Albrecht: Yes
- Carol Blood: Yes
- Bruce Bostelman: Yes
- Tom Brewer: Yes
- Tom Briese: Yes
- Steve Erdman: Yes
- Suzanne Geist: Yes
- Steve Halloran: Yes
- Mike Hilgers: Present - Not Voting
- Lou Ann Linehan: Yes
- John Lowe: Yes
- Mike McDonnell: Yes
- Dan Quick: Yes
- Tony Vargas: Present - Not Voting
- Lynne Walz: Yes
- Justin Wayne: Present - Not Voting
- Anna Wishart: Yes
- Robert Clements: Yes
- John Arch: Yes
- Tom Brandt: Yes
- Machaela Cavanaugh: Yes
- Wendy DeBoer: Yes
- Myron Dorn: Yes
- Tim Gragert: Yes
- Megan Hunt: Yes
- Andrew La Grone: Yes
- Mike Moser: Yes
- Dave Murman: Yes
- Julie Slama: Yes
- Ben Hansen: Present - Not Voting
March 3, 2020: ADVANCE TO E&R INITIAL
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 10
- Absent: 2
Details:
+
−
- Kate Bolz: Present - Not Voting
- Ernie Chambers: Present - Not Voting
- Sue Crawford: Yes
- Sara Howard: Present - Not Voting
- Rick Kolowski: Yes
- Steve Lathrop: Present - Not Voting
- Jim Scheer: Yes
- Curt Friesen: Yes
- Mike Groene: Present - Not Voting
- Matt Hansen: Present - Not Voting
- Robert Hilkemann: Yes
- Dan Hughes: Yes
- Mark Kolterman: Excused - Not Voting
- Brett Lindstrom: Present - Not Voting
- John McCollister: Present - Not Voting
- Adam Morfeld: Yes
- Patty Pansing Brooks: Yes
- John Stinner: Yes
- Matt Williams: Yes
- Joni Albrecht: Yes
- Carol Blood: Yes
- Bruce Bostelman: Yes
- Tom Brewer: Yes
- Tom Briese: Yes
- Steve Erdman: Yes
- Suzanne Geist: Yes
- Steve Halloran: Yes
- Mike Hilgers: Yes
- Lou Ann Linehan: Excused - Not Voting
- John Lowe: Yes
- Mike McDonnell: Yes
- Dan Quick: Yes
- Tony Vargas: Yes
- Lynne Walz: Yes
- Justin Wayne: Yes
- Anna Wishart: Yes
- Robert Clements: Yes
- John Arch: Yes
- Tom Brandt: Yes
- Machaela Cavanaugh: Present - Not Voting
- Wendy DeBoer: Present - Not Voting
- Myron Dorn: Yes
- Tim Gragert: Yes
- Megan Hunt: Yes
- Andrew La Grone: Yes
- Mike Moser: Yes
- Dave Murman: Yes
- Julie Slama: Yes
- Ben Hansen: Yes
+ − Sponsors (2)
Hughes
Type:
Primary Sponsor