+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 9, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on March 09, 2016
On March 3, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on March 03, 2016
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2
On March 1, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On February 29, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
On February 18, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Select File
On February 16, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
On February 5, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Placed on General File
On January 13, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for January 20, 2016
On January 8, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Health and Human Services Committee
On January 7, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor