+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 31, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on March 28, 2014
On March 24, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on March 24, 2014
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 47-0-2
On March 10, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On March 6, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
- Hadley AM2114 adopted
On March 5, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Hadley AM2114 filed
On February 27, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Select File
On February 26, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
On February 20, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Transportation and Telecommunications priority bill
On January 29, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Placed on General File
On January 14, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for January 21, 2014
On January 13, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee
On January 10, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Amendment
Hadley AM2114
adopted
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor