+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (37)
On April 20, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Provisions/portions of LB1088 amended into LB774 by AM2422
- Provisions/portions of LB1015 amended into LB774 by AM2422
- Provisions/portions of LB1014 amended into LB774 by AM2648
- Provisions/portions of LB888 amended into LB774 by AM2422
- Provisions/portions of LB542 amended into LB774 by AM2422
- Provisions/portions of LB510 amended into LB774 by AM2422
- Approved by Governor on April 18, 2016
- Provisions/portions of LB1047 amended into LB774 by AM2422
On April 12, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Motion to return to Select File withdrawn
- Motion to return to Select File withdrawn
- Scheer FA129 filed
- Scheer FA129 withdrawn
- Hadley motion to suspend rules and vote on final passage without further amendments, motions, or debate withdrawn
- Groene FA136 filed
- Groene FA136 withdrawn
- Dispensing of reading at large approved
- Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 37-10-2
- President/Speaker signed
- Presented to Governor on April 12, 2016
On April 7, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Hadley motion to suspend rules and vote on final passage without further amendments, motions, or debate filed
On April 4, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On April 1, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
- Bloomfield AM2725 withdrawn
- Enrollment and Review ER224 adopted
On March 29, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Bloomfield AM2725 filed
On March 24, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Enrollment and Review ER224 filed
- Placed on Select File with ER224
On March 22, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
- Stinner AM2648 adopted
- Revenue AM2422 adopted
On March 18, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Stinner AM2648 filed
On March 8, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Revenue AM2422 filed
- Placed on General File with AM2422
On February 19, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Revenue priority bill
On January 28, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 05, 2016
On January 8, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Revenue Committee
On January 7, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor