+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 23, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Provisions/portions of LB846 amended into LB768 by AM1945
On April 7, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on April 04, 2014
On March 31, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on March 31, 2014
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 49-0-0
- Dispensing of reading at large approved
- Davis AM2610 withdrawn
- Davis AM2610 filed
- Motion to return to Select File withdrawn
- Larson AM2658 withdrawn
- Larson AM2658 filed
- Motion to return to Select File failed
On March 26, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On March 25, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Enrollment and Review ER163 adopted
- Larson AM2401 filed
- Larson AM2401 lost
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
On March 11, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Enrollment and Review ER163 filed
- Placed on Select File with ER163
On March 6, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
- Agriculture AM1945 adopted
- Larson AM2219 withdrawn
- Larson AM2219 pending
- Larson AM2219 filed
- Agriculture AM1945 pending
On February 20, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Agriculture AM1945 filed
- Placed on General File with AM1945
- Agriculture priority bill
On January 24, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 11, 2014
On January 10, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Agriculture Committee
On January 9, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Amendments (6)
Davis AM2610
withdrawn
Larson AM2658
withdrawn
Larson AM2401
lost
Enrollment and Review ER163
adopted
Larson AM2219
withdrawn
Agriculture AM1945
adopted
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor