+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 10, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on April 10, 2014
- Presented to Governor on April 09, 2014
On April 9, 2014 in the Legislature:
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3
On April 2, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On March 31, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
- Conrad AM2272 adopted
On March 26, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Select File
On March 25, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Conrad AM2272 filed
On March 24, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
- Business and Labor AM1759 adopted
On February 21, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Business and Labor AM1759 filed
- Placed on General File with AM1759
On January 24, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 03, 2014
On January 10, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Business and Labor Committee
On January 9, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
Conrad AM2272
adopted
Business and Labor AM1759
adopted
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor