+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 25, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on February 24, 2016
On February 18, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on February 18, 2016
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 46-0-3
- Dispensing of reading at large approved
On February 10, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On February 8, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
- Enrollment and Review ER155 adopted
On February 3, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Enrollment and Review ER155 filed
- Placed on Select File with ER155
On February 1, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
- Banking, Commerce and Insurance AM1852 adopted
On January 20, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Banking, Commerce and Insurance AM1852 filed
- Placed on General File with AM1852
On January 12, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for January 19, 2016
On January 7, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee
On January 6, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor