+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On April 23, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Provisions/portions of LB75 amended into LB987 by AM2458
On April 17, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Indefinitely postponed
On March 12, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Schilz name added
- Kintner name added
- Revenue AM2392 filed
- Placed on General File with AM2392
- Krist name added
On January 8, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Title printed. Carryover bill.
On March 15, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Janssen priority bill
On January 23, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for January 31, 2013
On January 14, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Revenue Committee
On January 10, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Amendment
Revenue AM2392
pending
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor