+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 25, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on February 24, 2016
On February 18, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on February 18, 2016
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3
On February 10, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On February 8, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
- Enrollment and Review ER157 adopted
On February 3, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Enrollment and Review ER157 filed
- Placed on Select File with ER157
On February 1, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
On January 22, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Placed on General File
On January 13, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for January 20, 2016
On January 7, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Natural Resources Committee
On January 6, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor