+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 18, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on April 11, 2018
On April 11, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on April 10, 2018
On April 10, 2018 in the Legislature:
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4
On April 6, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On April 4, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
On March 27, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Select File
On March 26, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
On January 25, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Placed on General File
On January 8, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for January 16, 2018
- Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee
On January 3, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor