+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 18, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on April 11, 2018
On April 11, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on April 10, 2018
On April 10, 2018 in the Legislature:
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4
On April 6, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading with ST59
On April 4, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
- Enrollment and Review ER152 adopted
On March 28, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Enrollment and Review ER152 filed
- Placed on Select File with ER152
On March 26, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
- Health and Human Services AM1526 adopted
On January 30, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Health and Human Services AM1526 filed
- Placed on General File with AM1526
On January 10, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for January 19, 2018
On January 8, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Health and Human Services Committee
On January 3, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor