+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 30, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on March 30, 2016
On March 24, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on March 24, 2016
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1
On March 9, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On March 7, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
On February 25, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Select File
On February 23, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
On February 18, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Agriculture priority bill
On February 10, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Placed on General File
On January 12, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for January 19, 2016
On January 7, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Agriculture Committee
On January 6, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor