+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 20, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on April 18, 2016
On April 12, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on April 12, 2016
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 45-2-2
- Hadley motion to suspend rules and vote on final passage without further amendments, motions, or debate withdrawn
On April 7, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Hadley motion to suspend rules and vote on final passage without further amendments, motions, or debate filed
On March 15, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On March 10, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
- Baker AM2435 adopted
On March 7, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Baker AM2435 filed
- Placed on Select File
On March 2, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
- Health and Human Services AM2126 adopted
On February 22, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Health and Human Services AM2126 filed
- Placed on General File with AM2126
On February 19, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Baker priority bill
On January 14, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for January 22, 2016
On January 7, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Health and Human Services Committee
On January 6, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor