+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 19, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on February 15, 2013
On February 12, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on February 11, 2013
On February 11, 2013 in the Legislature:
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 49-0-0
On February 6, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading with ST2
On February 5, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
- McCoy AM108 adopted
- McCoy AM73 withdrawn
On February 4, 2013 in the Legislature:
- McCoy AM108 filed
On January 31, 2013 in the Legislature:
- McCoy AM73 filed
On January 30, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Select File
On January 28, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
On January 23, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Placed on General File
On January 15, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for January 22, 2013
On January 14, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee
On January 10, 2013 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
McCoy AM108
adopted
McCoy AM73
withdrawn
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor