+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 7, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Bill withdrawn
- Hilkemann MO18 prevailed
On March 1, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Correction
On February 28, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Hilkemann MO18 Withdraw bill filed
On January 25, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Appropriations Committee
On January 24, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Blood name added
On January 23, 2019 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Vote
March 7, 2019: MOTION TO WITHDRAW
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 10
- Absent: 9
Details:
+
−
- Kate Bolz: Yes
- Ernie Chambers: Excused - Not Voting
- Sue Crawford: Present - Not Voting
- Sara Howard: Yes
- Rick Kolowski: Excused - Not Voting
- Steve Lathrop: Yes
- Jim Scheer: Yes
- Curt Friesen: Present - Not Voting
- Mike Groene: Yes
- Matt Hansen: Present - Not Voting
- Robert Hilkemann: Yes
- Dan Hughes: Excused - Not Voting
- Mark Kolterman: Present - Not Voting
- Brett Lindstrom: Present - Not Voting
- John McCollister: Present - Not Voting
- Adam Morfeld: Excused - Not Voting
- Patty Pansing Brooks: Yes
- John Stinner: Yes
- Matt Williams: Yes
- Joni Albrecht: Yes
- Carol Blood: Yes
- Bruce Bostelman: Yes
- Tom Brewer: Yes
- Tom Briese: Present - Not Voting
- Steve Erdman: Yes
- Suzanne Geist: Yes
- Steve Halloran: Yes
- Mike Hilgers: Yes
- Lou Ann Linehan: Yes
- John Lowe: Present - Not Voting
- Mike McDonnell: Excused - Not Voting
- Dan Quick: Yes
- Tony Vargas: Excused - Not Voting
- Lynne Walz: Excused - Not Voting
- Justin Wayne: Present - Not Voting
- Anna Wishart: Yes
- Robert Clements: Yes
- John Arch: Present - Not Voting
- Tom Brandt: Yes
- Machaela Cavanaugh: Excused - Not Voting
- Wendy DeBoer: Yes
- Myron Dorn: Yes
- Tim Gragert: Yes
- Megan Hunt: Excused - Not Voting
- Andrew La Grone: Yes
- Mike Moser: Yes
- Dave Murman: Yes
- Julie Slama: Yes
- Ben Hansen: Yes
+ − Sponsors (2)
Hilkemann
Type:
Primary Sponsor