+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 10, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on April 10, 2014
- Presented to Governor on April 09, 2014
On April 9, 2014 in the Legislature:
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 48-0-1
On March 31, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On March 27, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
On March 25, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Select File
On March 24, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
On January 23, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Placed on General File
On January 14, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for January 21, 2014
On January 10, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee
On January 8, 2014 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor