+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 6, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on April 06, 2016
On March 31, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on March 31, 2016
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2
On March 24, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On March 23, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
On March 21, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Select File
On March 18, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
On February 25, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Placed on General File
On February 1, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 18, 2016
On January 7, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Natural Resources Committee
On January 6, 2016 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor