+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 3, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on March 3, 2022
On February 28, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on February 28, 2022
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4
- Cavanaugh, M. MO149 withdrawn
On February 22, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Cavanaugh, M. MO149 Bracket until April 20, 2022 filed
On February 16, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On February 14, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
On February 9, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Select File
On February 8, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
On February 2, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Placed on General File
On January 13, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for January 24, 2022
On January 10, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Executive Board
On January 5, 2022 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Votes (2)
February 28, 2022: Final Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 3
February 8, 2022: ADVANCE TO E&R INITIAL
- Yeas: 43
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Hughes
Type:
Primary Sponsor